Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 256 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 256 Week
» 34831 Month
» 104310 Year
» 1325875 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5266 m/e 03/1926
GWR (Rblds) 7231 m/e 03/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 72xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520503/1926
720012/1935
Wheels 2-8-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1926
Withdrawal During 10/1964
Scrapping During 02/1965
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1962
88B Radyr 4w/e 29/06/1963
87F Llanelly 4w/e 27/07/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 27/07/1963
WDN   3w/e 05/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev