Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 377 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1762 Week
» 8567 Month
» 115513 Year
» 1337078 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5267 m/e 03/1926
GWR (Rblds) 7232 m/e 03/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520503/1926
720008/1935
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1926
Withdrawal During 05/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965
Service Life 39 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 30/09/1950
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 17/05/1952
87F Llanelly 4w/e 24/01/1959
88C Barry 4w/e 29/06/1963
87F Llanelly 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 25/01/1947
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 87F Llanelly m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 30/11/1963
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev