Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1588 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19391 Week
» 72407 Month
» 191934 Year
» 3218787 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5268 |
08/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25118 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
08/05/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
07/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
07/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5268 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
05/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25118 |
|
|
04/01/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25118 |
|
|
06/08/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|