Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3538 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13112 Week
» 78066 Month
» 280730 Year
» 3307583 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5271 |
15/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25121 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
15/05/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5271 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25121 |
|
|
02/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25121 |
|
|
08/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|