Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2633 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16039 Week
» 69055 Month
» 188582 Year
» 3215435 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5272 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7237 |
on |
28/01/1936 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
233 |
To Service |
During 04/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/06/1963 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5272 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
28/01/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7237 |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (86J) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
17/06/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7237 |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|