Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 2339 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15745 Week
» 68761 Month
» 188288 Year
» 3215141 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5273 |
22/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25123 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
22/05/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
01/05/1983 |
Time in Service |
18 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys |
Cut Up |
07/1987 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/05/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
27/08/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
27/08/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5273 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
27/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25123 |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/05/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25123 |
|
|
07/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|