Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1565 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19368 Week
» 72384 Month
» 191911 Year
» 3218764 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5273 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7238 |
on |
04/02/1936 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
233 |
To Service |
During 04/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/04/1964 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5273 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
04/02/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7238 |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (BAN) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
20/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7238 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|