Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 129 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 129 Week
» 6263 Month
» 234147 Year
» 1455712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5274 m/e 04/1926
GWR (Rblds) 7239 m/e 02/1936

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520504/1926
720002/1936
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 233
To Service During 04/1926
Withdrawal During 10/1963
Scrapping During 06/1964
Service Life 37 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1926
81F Oxford 8w/e 11/07/1953
88B Radyr 4w/e 06/10/1962
87F Llanelly 2w/e 17/11/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 2w/e 17/11/1962
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1949 Swindon Works (entering Works) New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5274
Built at Swindon Works
   
02/1936 Renumbered Renumbered to 7239    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 7239    

prev prev