Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 512 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18315 Week
» 71331 Month
» 190858 Year
» 3217711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5275 |
03/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25125 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
03/06/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 03/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5275 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25125 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25125 |
|
|
04/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|