Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 155 Today
» 1178 Yesterday
» 1333 Week
» 1333 Month
» 190468 Year
» 1412033 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5275 m/e 07/1930
GWR (Rblds) 7200 m/e 08/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520507/1930
720008/1934
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 266
To Service During 07/1930
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Service Life 33 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1930
87E Landore 4w/e 01/11/1952
87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 18/06/1960
87F Llanelly 4w/e 05/11/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NA Newton Abbot 4w/e 22/02/1947
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 05/11/1960
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev