Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.



Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1052 Today
» 1268 Yesterday
» 1052 Week
» 22561 Month
» 92284 Year
» 603386 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)


In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5275   07/1926
GWR (Rblds) 7200   07/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 07/1926
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Service Life 37 yrs

Code Name From Date
87E Landore 4w/e 01/11/1952
87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 18/06/1960
87F Llanelly 4w/e 05/11/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NA Newton Abbot 4w/e 22/02/1947
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 05/11/1960
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev