Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 113 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 113 Week
» 6247 Month
» 234131 Year
» 1455696 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5276 m/e 08/1930
GWR (Rblds) 7201 m/e 08/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520508/1930
720008/1934
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 266
To Service During 08/1930
Withdrawal During 04/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965
Service Life 34 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1930
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 30/09/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/01/1955
86G Pontypool Road 8w/e 26/03/1955
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 20/07/1964
87F Llanelly 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 20/07/1964
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 3w/e 05/10/1964
WDN   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1930 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5276
Built at Swindon Works
   
08/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 7201    
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7201    

prev prev