31/03/1949 |
Swindon Works |
New Work March: Nos. *7901 Dodington Hall (23/3), *7902 Eaton Mascot Hall (31/3); 9675 MTHR 4/3), 9676 CYS (10/3), 9677 CED (17/3). *Not allocated. Locomotives entering Works 28/2/49 to 30/3/49: Nos. 1002/09, 1086 (re-numbered 1147), 1213 (re-numbered 9), 1415, 1758 SDN (condemned), 1894 NPT (condemned), 2011/12, 2226/40/92/99, 2724 CYS (condemned), 69, 2806/36/71/82/83, 2902/15/31/81/87, 3032/33/43, 3175, 3386, 3562 OXF (condemned), 3616/45/55/88, 3719/44/47, 3819/29, 3901/55 (both for re-conversion), 4000/03/07/13/49, 4213/37/60/70, 4527/35/38/58/65/69/98, 4624, 4703, 4806/51 (both for re-conversion), 4936/55, 5020/33/55/57/75/89/91/95, 5166, 5310/30/41/72/96, 5509/66, 5719/28/98, 5931/79/88, 6017/24/25/28, 6132/53, 6341/53, 6720/47, 6803/22/54, 6900/02/07/33/46/55/62/64, 7202/09, 7302, 7415, 7766/84, 8753, 9311, 9600, 9704/08 and Class '8' W.D. 77234 (re-numbered 90201). Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include:-Nos. 1002/28, 2947, 4990, 6917/24, while Nos. 4007/20 are painted green and also lined. Works' pilots recently have been:-Nos. *212/13/46 and **1900. *Condemned 7/48. **Condemned 4/48. No. 3150 has been fitted with the curved front end frames and cylinders (outside steam pipes) of No. 3184 (condemned in 1948). The original frames of No. 3150 had a square front end and the cylinders had internal steam pipes. No. 2123 has been fitted with auto gear. |
SLS/194905 |
10/04/1965 |
Locomotives Stored at Barry (Behind Barry Works) |
In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 2873, 3612, 3845, 4253, 4270, 4561, 4566, 4588, 5193, 5227, 5521, 5526, 5532, 5538, 5539, 5541, 5542, 5552, 5553, 5557, 5558, 5570, 5572, 5651, 5794, 5814, 5952, 6023, 6024, 6115, 7229, 7722, 7903, 8419, 9462, 9468, 9629, 30541, 30830, 34016, 34027, 34028, 34058, 34067, 34070, 34072, 34073, 34081, 34092, 34105, 35006, 35009, 35018, 35025, 92207, 92245. Behind Barry Works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4277, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5619, 5637, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6692, 6695, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31618, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 45690, 48431, 53808, 53809. |
SLS/196505 |
05/09/1965 |
Locomotives Stored at Barry (Behind Barry Works) |
In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 4156, 5526, 6024, 34067, 44123, 2873, 4157, 5532, 7229, 34070, 44422, 3612, 4160, 5538, 7903, 34072, 45699, 3814, 4253, 5539, 9629, 34073, 3845, 4270, 5541, 34081, 80067, 3862, 4561, 5542, 30541, 34092, 92207, 4110, 4566, 5552, 30830, 34105, 92245, 4115, 4588, 5553, 34016, 35006, 4121, 5193, 5572, 34027, 35009, 4144, 5227, 5952, 34028, 35018, 4150, 5521, 6023, 34058, 35025; Behind Barry Works: 2807, 4930, 5199, 6619, 30499, 45690, 2857, 4936, 5224, 6634, 30506, 48431, 2861, 4942, 5239, 6686, 30825, 53808, 2874, 4953, 5322, 6695, 30828, 53809, 2885, 4979, 5619, 6960, 30841, 31625, 3803, 4983, 5637, 6989, 30847, 31638, 3822, 5029, 5643, 7027, 31618, 4141, 5043, 5668, 7200, 31806, 4247, 5051, 5900, 7202, 31874, 4248, 5080, 5967, 7325, 4277, 5164, 5972, 9466. |
SLS/196510 |
06/02/1966 |
Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry |
5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. |
SLS/196603 |
16/10/1967 |
Barry Works |
Dumped locomotives - behind the works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5637, 5643, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 42765, 48431, 45690, 53809, 71000, 75014, 92134. Total :58. |
SLS/196712 |
07/07/1968 |
Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks |
Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. |
SLS/196810 |