Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 14 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6229 Week
» 17934 Month
» 349423 Year
» 426010 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5277   08/1926
GWR (Rblds) 7202   08/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520508/1926
720009/1934
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 08/1926
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Service Life 37 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
136 Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 01/12/1945
88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 01/12/1945
ALLOC RYR Radyr m/e 30/04/1948
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   2w/e 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev