Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1957 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19760 Week
» 72776 Month
» 192303 Year
» 3219156 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5278 |
12/06/1964 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/06/1964 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5278 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
01/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
02/05/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5278 |
|
|
10/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: at Peak Forest |
|
|