Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 805 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14211 Week
» 67227 Month
» 186754 Year
» 3213607 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5280 |
m/e |
08/1930 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7205 |
on |
17/10/1934 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
266 |
To Service |
During 08/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/06/1965 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5280 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
17/10/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7205 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberdare (ABDR) |
|
|
30/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
10/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
16/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
16/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7205 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|