Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 312 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18115 Week
» 71131 Month
» 190658 Year
» 3217511 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5283 |
02/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25133 |
10/10/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
02/07/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
28/08/1983 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
Cut Up |
30/06/1987 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
02/07/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
08/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
08/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5283 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
10/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25133 |
|
|
28/08/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25133 |
|
|
30/06/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|