Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3689 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17095 Week
» 70111 Month
» 189638 Year
» 3216491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5283 |
m/e |
09/1930 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7208 |
on |
29/10/1934 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
266 |
To Service |
During 09/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/04/1964 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5283 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
29/10/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7208 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
31/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
20/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7208 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|