Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4011 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17417 Week
» 70433 Month
» 189960 Year
» 3216813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5284 |
09/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25134 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
09/07/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
19/12/1982 |
Time in Service |
18 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
29/02/1988 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/07/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
11/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5284 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25134 |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
19/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25134 |
|
|
29/02/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|