Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 294 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 294 Week
» 34869 Month
» 104348 Year
» 1325913 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5284 m/e 09/1926
GWR (Rblds) 7209 m/e 09/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
520509/1926
720011/1934
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1926
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 37 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 31/08/1950
83E St Blazey 4w/e 31/01/1951
87E Landore 4w/e 01/11/1952
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 16/07/1960
88B Radyr 4w/e 03/11/1962
88J Aberdare 4w/e 15/12/1962
88C Barry 7w/e 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 83E St Blazey w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 88C Barry 2w/e 08/06/1964
WDN   3w/e 10/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev