|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. | SLS/194708 |
18/05/1963 | Wolverhampton (Stafford Road) Works (In Works) | In Works1424, 3607(84G), 3763, 4132/55, 4278, 4646/80, 5263, 5938/75, 6690(88J), 6900/04/16/60/88, 7210, 9790/4. Waiting Works: L92 (ex-5786), 2896, 4255, 6648. Ex Works: 8400, 6134. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1930 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5285 Built at Swindon Works |
||
01/11/1934 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7210 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) | ||
09/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
30/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
22/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) | ||
30/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7210 | ||
09/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |