Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2961 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16367 Week
» 69383 Month
» 188910 Year
» 3215763 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5287 |
29/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25137 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/07/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5287 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
05/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
17/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25137 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
28/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
02/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25137 |
|
|
04/06/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|