Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1273 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19076 Week
» 72092 Month
» 191619 Year
» 3218472 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5288 |
m/e |
09/1930 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7213 |
on |
24/09/1934 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
266 |
To Service |
During 09/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/09/1964 |
Service Life |
34 yrs , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1930 |
ABDR |
|
Aberdare |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
84B |
|
Oxley |
4w/e |
03/12/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/09/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84B |
Oxley |
4w/e |
03/12/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
3w/e |
14/09/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/01/1963 |
Wolverhampton Works (In Works) |
In Works: 1013/24, 1656/64, 2855, 3628(86G), 3788, 4136, 5244(86B), 6357(87C), 6692, 6975(87A), 7213, 7443, 7824, 8405/37/64, 8720, 9612/69, 9724. In Yard: 2257, 6915/6(89A), 9768. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5288 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
24/09/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7213 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberdare (ABDR) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7213 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|