Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 549 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19460 Week
» 84414 Month
» 287078 Year
» 3313931 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5291 |
24/08/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25141 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
24/08/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/08/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/08/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5291 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25141 |
|
|
07/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
19/09/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25141 |
|
|
01/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|