Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1048 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14454 Week
» 67470 Month
» 186997 Year
» 3213850 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5292 |
m/e |
10/1930 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7217 |
on |
28/09/1934 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
266 |
To Service |
During 10/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/07/1964 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/05/1958 |
Neath MPD |
In store are 4274, 6604/29, 7217. New diesel shunters here are D3361, D3432/3/4/5/6/7. These are allocated to Port Talbot but are maintained and refuelled at Neath. |
SLS/195808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5292 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
28/09/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7217 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86F) |
|
|
06/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7217 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|