Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 814 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14220 Week
» 67236 Month
» 186763 Year
» 3213616 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5293 |
02/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25143 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
02/09/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/09/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5293 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
02/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
19/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25143 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
14/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25143 |
|
|
10/11/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|