Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 849 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18652 Week
» 71668 Month
» 191195 Year
» 3218048 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5297 |
18/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25147 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
18/09/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/09/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5297 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
19/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25147 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
30/03/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25147 |
|
|
09/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|