Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2432 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15838 Week
» 68854 Month
» 188381 Year
» 3215234 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5298 |
28/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25148 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/09/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/09/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5298 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
06/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
19/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25148 |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
07/09/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25148 from Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
12/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|