Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 898 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 898 Week
» 23879 Month
» 387124 Year
» 463711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5301 12/09/1958
TOPS (Tops) 26001 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 12/09/1958
Withdrawn 04/10/1993
Time in Service 35 yrs , 22 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 12/09/1958
64B Haymarket w/e 23/04/1960
ED Eastfield w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 04/10/1993

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/09/1958 To Service To service as D5301
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26001    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
04/10/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 26001    

prev prev