Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 225 Today
» 1220 Yesterday
» 225 Week
» 27699 Month
» 324713 Year
» 401300 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5302 02/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 26002 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 02/10/1958
Withdrawn 09/10/1992
Time in Service 34 yrs , 7 dys
Cut Up 22/11/1994
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 02/10/1958
64B Haymarket w/e 30/04/1960
ED Eastfield w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 09/10/1992

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/10/1958 To Service To service as D5302
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26002    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
09/10/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 26002    

prev prev