Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 828 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5799 Week
» 20376 Month
» 383621 Year
» 460208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5303 17/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 26003 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 17/10/1958
Withdrawn 04/10/1993
Time in Service 34 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 25/01/1995
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 17/10/1958
64H Leith Central 4w/e 22/11/1958
34B Hornsey w/e 20/12/1958
64B Haymarket w/e 30/04/1960
ED Eastfield w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 04/10/1993

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/10/1958 To Service To service as D5303
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26003    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
04/10/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 26003    
25/01/1995 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev