Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 806 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18609 Week
» 71625 Month
» 191152 Year
» 3218005 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5303 |
17/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26003 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
17/10/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1966 |
|
Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
|
|
by 12/1966 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/10/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1966 |
vos |
Vacuum brakes, No heat, Slow Speed Control |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
04/09/1963 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5303 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
12/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
12/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26003 |
|
|
05/10/1987 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/10/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26003 |
|
|
25/01/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|