Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 879 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 879 Week
» 23860 Month
» 387105 Year
» 463692 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5304 31/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 26004 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 31/10/1958
Withdrawn 24/11/1992
Time in Service 34 yrs , 24 dys
Cut Up 23/11/1994
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 31/10/1958
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 07/05/1960
ED Eastfield w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 24/11/1992

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1958 To Service To service as D5304
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
05/11/1967 Sightings Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point. RCTS 1/1968 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26004    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
24/11/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 26004    

prev prev