Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 580 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1714 Week
» 21447 Month
» 318461 Year
» 395048 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5306 28/11/1958
TOPS (Tops) 26006 05/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 28/11/1958
Withdrawn 06/09/1993
Time in Service 34 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 08/06/1995
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 28/11/1958
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 28/05/1960
ED Eastfield w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 06/09/1993


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/11/1958 To Service To service as D5306
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
28/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26006    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
06/09/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 26006    
08/06/1995 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev