Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 167 Today
» 1283 Yesterday
» 3933 Week
» 26914 Month
» 390159 Year
» 466746 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5308 12/12/1958
TOPS (Tops) 26008 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 12/12/1958
Withdrawn 12/03/1993
Time in Service 34 yrs , 3 mths
Cut Up 13/07/1994
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 12/12/1958
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 14/05/1960
64B Haymarket 4w/e 04/06/1960
IS Inverness 4w/e 25/10/1975
   Withdrawn 12/03/1993


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/12/1958 To Service To service as D5308
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
14/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26008    
25/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (IS)    
12/03/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 26008    
13/07/1994 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev