Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 300 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3762 Week
» 23495 Month
» 320509 Year
» 397096 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5309 19/12/1958
TOPS (Tops) 26009 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 19/12/1958
Withdrawn 27/01/1977
Time in Service 18 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys
Cut Up 30/04/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 19/12/1958
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 21/05/1960
64B Haymarket 4w/e 04/06/1960
IS Inverness 3w/e 15/11/1975
   Withdrawn 27/01/1977

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/12/1958 To Service To service as D5309
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
27/08/1968 Sightings Dundee depot: Around the area - On the shed RO 12/1968 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26009    
15/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (IS)    
27/01/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as 26009    
30/04/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev