Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 302 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3764 Week
» 23497 Month
» 320511 Year
» 397098 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5310 06/01/1959
TOPS (Tops) 26010 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 06/01/1959
Withdrawn 04/12/1992
Time in Service 33 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 06/01/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 28/05/1960
IS Inverness 3w/e 15/11/1975
   Withdrawn 04/12/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/01/1959 To Service To service as D5310
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
28/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26010    
15/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (IS)    
04/12/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 26010    

prev prev