Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 580 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1714 Week
» 21447 Month
» 318461 Year
» 395048 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5312 16/01/1959
TOPS (Tops) 26012 05/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 16/01/1959
Withdrawn 31/01/1982
Time in Service 23 yrs , 15 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1982
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 16/01/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 04/06/1960
IS Inverness 3w/e 15/11/1975
   Withdrawn 31/01/1982


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/01/1959 To Service To service as D5312
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26012    
15/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (IS)    
31/01/1982 Withdrawn Condemned as 26012    
01/08/1982 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev