Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 167 Today
» 1283 Yesterday
» 3933 Week
» 26914 Month
» 390159 Year
» 466746 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5313 23/01/1959
TOPS (Tops) 26013 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 23/01/1959
Withdrawn 18/03/1985
Time in Service 26 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys
Cut Up 30/06/1987
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 23/01/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 04/06/1960
IS Inverness 3w/e 15/11/1975
   Withdrawn 18/03/1985

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/01/1959 To Service To service as D5313
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Aberdeen: Around the area - In vicinity of the station RO 11/1968 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26013    
15/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (IS)    
18/03/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 26013    
30/06/1987 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev