Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 897 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 897 Week
» 23878 Month
» 387123 Year
» 463710 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5314 30/01/1959
TOPS (Tops) 26014 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 30/01/1959
Withdrawn 09/10/1992
Time in Service 33 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 29/11/1994
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 30/01/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 25/06/1960
IS Inverness 3w/e 15/11/1975
   Withdrawn 09/10/1992

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/01/1959 To Service To service as D5314
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
25/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop SLS 7/1962 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26014    
15/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (IS)    
09/10/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 26014    

prev prev