Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 870 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 870 Week
» 23851 Month
» 387096 Year
» 463683 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5316 20/03/1959
TOPS (Tops) 26016 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 20/03/1959
Withdrawn 05/10/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 01/09/1976
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 20/03/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 02/07/1960
60A Inverness 4w/e 26/08/1967
64B Haymarket 4w/e 27/01/1968
   Withdrawn 05/10/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/03/1959 To Service To service as D5316
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
26/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
27/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26016    
05/10/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 26016    
01/09/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev