Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1583 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19386 Week
» 72402 Month
» 191929 Year
» 3218782 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5317 |
27/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26017 |
01/12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
27/02/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/02/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
10/05/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/02/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5317 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26017 |
|
|
15/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
08/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
29/08/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26017 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|