Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 580 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1714 Week
» 21447 Month
» 318461 Year
» 395048 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5319 13/03/1959
TOPS (Tops) 26019 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 13/03/1959
Withdrawn 18/03/1985
Time in Service 26 yrs , 5 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1987
Cut At Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 13/03/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 01/10/1960
60A Inverness 4w/e 21/04/1962
64B Haymarket 5w/e 30/10/1965
60A Inverness 5w/e 31/12/1966
64B Haymarket 5w/e 29/04/1967
60A Inverness 4w/e 26/08/1967
64B Haymarket 5w/e 30/11/1968
IS Inverness 4w/e 25/10/1975
   Withdrawn 18/03/1985

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/03/1959 To Service To service as D5319
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
01/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
30/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
26/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Inverness depot: On shed RO 11/1968 Link
30/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26019    
25/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (IS)    
18/03/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 26019    
01/05/1987 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: at Thornton Yard    

prev prev