Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 363 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18166 Week
» 71182 Month
» 190709 Year
» 3217562 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
5323 |
m/e |
09/1917 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
206 |
Works Number |
2695 |
To Service |
During 09/1917 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/06/1958 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1946 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5323 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2695 |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
09/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
09/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5323 |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|