Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1078 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18881 Week
» 71897 Month
» 191424 Year
» 3218277 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5326 |
22/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26026 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
22/05/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/05/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
12/12/1963 |
Severe |
|
Not known |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5326 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26026 |
|
|
25/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
24/11/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26026 |
|
|
22/06/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|