Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2309 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15715 Week
» 68731 Month
» 188258 Year
» 3215111 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5329 |
12/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26029 |
07/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
12/06/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5329 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
07/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
24/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26029 |
|
|
13/10/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26029 |
|
|
30/11/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|