Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (Orig) 5332 m/e 11/1917
GWR (1st Renum) 8332 m/e 01/1928
GWR (2nd Renum) 5332 m/e 06/1944

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 207
Works Number 2704
To Service During 11/1917
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
114 Oxley 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
WLN Wellington 4w/e 29/12/1945
87F Llanelly 4w/e 01/11/1958
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 05/11/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC OXY Oxley m/e 30/04/1948
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 05/11/1960
WDN   m/e 31/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1917 To Service To service as GWR Number 5332
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2704
   
01/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8332    
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (114)    
19/02/1938 Sightings Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the yard. RO 3/1938 Link
06/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 5332    
29/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (WLN)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 5332    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Dump. SLS 1/1962 Link

prev prev