Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 659 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19570 Week
» 84524 Month
» 287188 Year
» 3314041 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5336 |
14/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26036 |
10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
14/08/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/08/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
17/10/1963 |
Severe |
All cables to Nos. 3 & 4 motors and cables in cubicle burnt |
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Handbrake had been left in the "ON" position in trailing cab. Subsequent sparking from the blocks ignited oily deposits on bogie. |
Dunphail |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5336 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26036 |
|
|
04/10/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26036 |
|
|
19/02/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|