Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2118 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19921 Week
» 72937 Month
» 192464 Year
» 3219317 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5339 |
04/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26039 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
04/09/1959 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
64B |
|
Haymarket (New) |
on |
04/09/1959 |
60A |
|
Inverness |
4w/e |
12/03/1960 |
|
|
Stored Unserviceable |
on |
05/10/1987 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/10/1990 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
17/10/1963 |
Not severe |
None |
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Oily deposit on No. 2 motor casing ignited by brake block spark. |
Killiecrankie |
26/08/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
ECS |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5339 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26039 |
|
|
05/10/1987 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
18/10/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26039 |
|
|
20/10/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|