Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3759 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13333 Week
» 78287 Month
» 280951 Year
» 3307804 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5345 |
23/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26045 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
23/10/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/10/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
vbh |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/02/1961 |
Unknown |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
26/07/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
30/03/1970 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5345 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26045 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26045 |
|
|
08/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|